Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0953
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 039-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Labor; 013-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 041-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass Labor; 012-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|