Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0960
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|