Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0593
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2024
|
Effective Date June 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee; 022-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|