Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0968
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-030-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-004-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 034-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 006-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|