Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0971
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|