Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Directed to Multiple Committees Behavioral and Mental Health, then Appropriations. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |