Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Postponed - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |