Senate | 07/11/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 07/02/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |