Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0990
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass Agriculture; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|