Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0999
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 005-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|