Senate | 05/03/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |