Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1000
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|