Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1001
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|