Senate | 04/19/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |