Senate | 03/27/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |