Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1004
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Postponed - Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|