Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0643
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|