Senate | 07/02/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |