Senate | 04/15/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Postponed - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |