Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1007
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this committee amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|