Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |