Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1016
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-003-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-011-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|