Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |