Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1026
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Restorative Justice
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|