Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |