Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0645
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|