Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1034
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Postponed - Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|