Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Postponed - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |