Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1037
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024; Some Provisions;
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 005-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|