Senate | 05/17/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Postponed - Higher Education | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |