Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1045
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|