Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|