Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1048
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|