Senate | 12/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino | ||
Senate | 08/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |