Senate | 12/16/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino | ||
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 11/20/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 11/06/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 10/28/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro | ||
Senate | 08/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |