Senate | 06/20/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |