Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|