Senate | 12/22/2024 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 11/14/2024 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose | ||
Senate | 11/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Postponed - Executive | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 11/06/2024 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 11/06/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 10/29/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 10/11/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 10/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 10/11/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci |