Senate | 06/26/2023 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Be Adopted Health and Human Services; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Filed with Secretary |