Senate | 05/19/2023 | Resolution Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 11, 2023 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Be Adopted Public Health; 005-002-000 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Assigned to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Filed with Secretary |