Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0144 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/23/2023

                    SR0144LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r   SR0144  LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r
  SR0144  LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Ann (O'Malley) Moore of Chicago, who
4  passed away on February 12, 2023; and
5  WHEREAS, Ann Moore was born to Ellen (Grady) and John
6  O'Malley in the Village of Dooagh on Achill Island in County
7  Mayo, Ireland on August 29, 1932; she arrived on Ellis Island
8  in New York on August 16, 1956; she then took a train to
9  Chicago, where she lived for the remainder of her life; she
10  married Joe Moore at St. Thomas More Catholic Church in
11  Chicago on September 8, 1962; and
12  WHEREAS, As a teenager, Ann Moore left home in search of
13  work; she first looked in Ireland and later in England, where
14  she was employed at a school in Liverpool for a time; while her
15  children were young, she served her family as a homemaker; she
16  later returned to work, having stints at Woolworth's
17  department store and Gladstone Bakery in Jefferson Park; and
18  WHEREAS, Ann Moore was a woman of strong faith; in her
19  golden years, she enjoyed taking daily walks in her
20  neighborhood, going on frequent lunch outings with her
21  friends, and spending quality time with her husband; and

 

  SR0144  LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r


SR0144- 2 -LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r   SR0144 - 2 - LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r
  SR0144 - 2 - LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r
1  WHEREAS, Ann Moore was known for her cooking and selfless
2  nature, finding no charity unworthy of her patronage; she will
3  be remembered for her devotion to her family as the family
4  matriarch; and
5  WHEREAS, Ann Moore was preceded in death by her husband,
6  Joe; her son, Patrick; her siblings, Patrick, Betty, Mary,
7  John, and Michael; and her parents; and
8  WHEREAS, Ann Moore is survived by her children, Mary (Jon)
9  Wentworth and Kevin (Patti); her grandchildren, Brian, Monica,
10  Brittany, Thomas, Brenden, Jennifer, Sean, Kaitlyn, and
11  Collin; her great-grandchildren, Tegen and Selena; her
12  siblings, Sr. Miriam O'Malley, Thomas (Christina) O'Malley,
13  and Christina (Kevin) Henry; and her many nieces and nephews;
14  therefore, be it
15  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL
16  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
17  Ann (O'Malley) Moore and extend our sincere condolences to her
18  family, friends, and all who knew and loved her; and be it
19  further
20  RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be
21  presented to the family of Ann Moore as an expression of our
22  deepest sympathy.

 

 

  SR0144 - 2 - LRB103 31515 ECR 59505 r