LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR0820
Action History
IL
Illinois Senate Bill SR0820
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois Senate Bill SR0820
Action History
Senate
05/25/2024
Resolution Adopted
Senate
04/10/2024
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 11, 2024
Senate
04/10/2024
Be Adopted Public Health; 005-000-000
Senate
03/20/2024
Assigned to Public Health
Senate
03/05/2024
Referred to Assignments
Senate
03/05/2024
Filed with Secretary