House | 03/21/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Re-assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/17/2024 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |