House | 04/11/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-007-000 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-002-000 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | To Income Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/20/2024 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |