Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Do Pass Labor; 012-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rick Ryan
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-028-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Briel
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|