House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Regan Deering | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason R. Bunting | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Education Policy Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |