House
|
04/11/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|