Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-040-000 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Motion Prevailed 070-039-000 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Jawaharial Williams | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 015-009-000 | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |