House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | To Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |