Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Gun Violence Prevention Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Gun Violence Prevention Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Gun Violence Prevention Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Gun Violence Prevention Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Gun Violence Prevention Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to Gun Violence Prevention Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|